Magnuson, William Howard (CPSO#: 52764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1984

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7529
Fax: (905) 848-7676
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Magnuson ( CPSO# 52764 )

Business Address:
The Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7285


Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM HOWARD MAGNUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGNUSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1984

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On December 10, 2010, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Magnuson.