Maguire, Jonathon Lee (CPSO#: 79440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
61 Queen St. East
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Children's After Hours Clinic
235 Danforth Avenue
Suite 100
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-3000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathon Maguire Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Maguire ( CPSO# 79440 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2nd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3655

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Business Address:
235 Danforth Avenue
Suite 100
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 461-3000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHON LEE MAGUIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGUIRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007