Maham, Nava (CPSO#: 73393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7663
Fax: (905) 804-7744
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Maham ( CPSO# 73393 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre - Mississauga
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7663

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 12 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVA MAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2003