Maher, John (CPSO#: 63155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
48 Alliance Boulevard
Unit 101
Barrie ON  L4M 5K3
Phone: (705) 721-1060
Fax: (705) 721-2442
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Maher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Maher ( CPSO# 63155 )

Business Address:
101 - 48 Alliance Boulevard
Barrie ON  L4M 5K3
Phone Number: (705) 721-1060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 25 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MAHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Sep 1990 to 12 Oct 1990
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 17 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1997