Mahmood, Adeel (CPSO#: 90726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
311 Wilson St E
Ancaster ON  L9G 2B8
Phone: 905 648 1878
Fax: 905 648 1879
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adeel Mahmood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mahmood ( CPSO# 90726 )

Business Address:
311 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 648-1878

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADEEL MAHMOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHMOOD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011