Mahmood, Tariq (CPSO#: 55943)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1987


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
1577 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1H7
Phone: (416) 461-0183
Fax: (416) 461-4833
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tariq Mahmood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2011

Dr. T. Mahmood ( CPSO# 55943 )

Business Address:
Unit 6
1577 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1H7
Phone Number: (416) 461-0183

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.


Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. TARIQ MAHMOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHMOOD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1987