Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mahoney, John Eric (CPSO#: 56827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital
Box 222
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8030
Fax: (613) 737-8982
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahoney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mahoney ( CPSO# 56827 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
PO Box 222
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8030

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 15 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ERIC MAHONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHONEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1987