Mahoney, Sean Richard (CPSO#: 81041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 9
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 523-9199
Fax: (705) 523-9197
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Espanola Regional Hospital
825 McKinnon Street
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Canada
Phone: (705) 869-1420
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Kirkwood Hospital
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Canada
Phone: (705) 675-5900
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Health Sciences North
Department of Family Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 674-3181
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sean Mahoney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mahoney ( CPSO# 81041 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
Espanola General Hospital
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Phone Number: (705) 869-1420

Business Address:
Unit 9
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9

Business Address:
Kirkwood Hospital
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 657-5900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN RICHARD MAHONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHONEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2007