Mahrouche Belbachir, Lilia (CPSO#: 84540)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Russian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gatineau Hospital
CSSS Gatineau
909,boul La verendrye
Gatineau QC  J8P 7H2
Phone: (819) 966-6333
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613)746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Children's Hospital of Eastern Onta
401, Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lilia Mahrouche Belbachir Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mahrouche Belbachir ( CPSO# 84540 )

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 701-0077

Business Address:
909 Boulevard De La Verendrye
Gatineau QC  J8P 7H2
Phone Number: (819) 966-6333

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILIA MAHROUCHE BELBACHIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHROUCHE BELBACHIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008