Mak, Victor (CPSO#: 63999)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
22 Richmond Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3Y1
Phone: (905) 770-0087
Fax: (905) 770-0047
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victor Mak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Mak ( CPSO# 63999 )

Business Address:
203 - 22 Richmond Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3Y1
Phone Number: (905) 770-0087

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992