Mak, Vincent Chi Wai (CPSO#: 63597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 222
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9S2
Phone: (905) 948-1717
Fax: (905) 948-1714
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent Mak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Mak ( CPSO# 63597 )

Business Address:
Suite 222
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9S2
Phone Number: (905) 948-1717

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 23 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT CHI WAI MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992