Mak, Wang-Cheong (CPSO#: 70876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Sheffield, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 313
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone: (905) 237-8118
Fax: (289) 809-3437
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wang-Cheong Mak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 70876 )

Business Address:
Suite 313
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone Number: (905) 237-8118

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WANG-CHEONG MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2012