Makary, David (CPSO#: 93901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-3103
Fax: (905) 853-2533
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 David Srive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Makary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Makary ( CPSO# 93901 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 853-3103

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 476-1800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MAKARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKARY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012