Makhija, Sapna (CPSO#: 80843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 32
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 335-1888
Fax: (905) 335-5656
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sapna Makhija Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Makhija ( CPSO# 80843 )

Business Address:
32 - 1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 335-1888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 02 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAPNA MAKHIJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKHIJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2004 to 24 Jun 2004
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2006 to 24 Sep 2006
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2007