Malam, Faiz Gulamali (CPSO#: 76084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (416) 747-3500
Fax: (905) 494-6563
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PRISM Eyecare
Unit 1
Millway Plaza
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Malam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Malam ( CPSO# 76084 )

Business Address:
7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3

Business Address:
51 Mountain Ash Road
Unit 8
Brampton ON  L6R 1M4

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (416) 747-3500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAIZ GULAMALI MALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 29 Feb 2004
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003