Malcolm, Brendan Patrick (CPSO#: 59722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Front Frederick Health
14th Floor
365 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3L4
Phone: (416) 362-8777
Fax: (416) 362-7879
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brendan Malcolm Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Malcolm ( CPSO# 59722 )

Business Address:
Front Frederick Health
14th Floor
365 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3L4
Phone Number: (416) 362-8777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDAN PATRICK MALCOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALCOLM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1989