Maleki-Yazdi, Mohammad Reza (CPSO#: 51154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 608
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 921-7704
Fax: (416) 921-3277
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.R. Maleki-Yazdi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maleki-Yazdi ( CPSO# 51154 )

Business Address:
608 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 921-7704

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD REZA MALEKI-YAZDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALEKI-YAZDI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1987