Malhotra, Birinder (CPSO#: 51156)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Delhi, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Western Ontario
Student Health Services
U C C Room 11
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3771
Fax: (519) 661-3380
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Parkwood Institute
550 Wellington Road South
London ON  N6C 0A7
Canada
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47587
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Malhotra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Malhotra ( CPSO# 51156 )

Business Address:
University of Western Ontario
Student Health Services
Room 11- UCC
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3771

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIRINDER MALHOTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALHOTRA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1987