Malig, Lita Liangco (CPSO#: 76699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: Andres, Lita Liangco Malig (used until: 15 Aug 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:Far Eastern University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 416
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 569-8377
Fax: (905) 569-8378
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lita Malig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Malig ( CPSO# 76699 )

Business Address:
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 416
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 569-8377

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LITA LIANGCO MALIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2003