Malik, Rebecca (CPSO#: 66628)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1885 Shermer Road
Northbrook IL  60062
United States
Phone: 847-272-4600
Fax: 847-272-4655
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Malik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Malik ( CPSO# 66628 )
Dr. R. Malik ( CPSO# 67493 )

Business Address:
204 Hamilton Road
London ON  N5V 1R1
Phone Number: (519) 601-2933

Business Address:
1885 Shermer Road
Northbrook IL  600 2
Phone Number: (847) 272-4600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Oct 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995