Malik, Rubina (CPSO#: 67493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
204 Hamilton Road
London ON  N5V 1R1
Phone: (519) 601-2933
Fax: (519) 204-2333
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jones Malik Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2007


Corporation Name: Rebecca Malik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Malik ( CPSO# 66628 )
Dr. R. Malik ( CPSO# 67493 )

Business Address:
204 Hamilton Road
London ON  N5V 1R1
Phone Number: (519) 601-2933

Business Address:
1885 Shermer Road
Northbrook IL  600 2
Phone Number: (847) 272-4600


Corporation Name: R. Malik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Malik ( CPSO# 67493 )

Business Address:
204 Hamilton Road
London ON  N5V 1R1
Phone Number: (519) 601-2933

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUBINA MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1998