Malik, Shiraz Akram (CPSO#: 86890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 54487
Fax: (519) 913-2899
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Parkwood Institute
St Joseph's Health Care London
550 Wellington Road South
London ON  N6C0A7
Canada
Phone: 5196466100
Fax: 5199132899
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

St. Joseph's Hospital
St. Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A4V2
Canada
Phone: 5196466100
Fax: 5199132899
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Malik Howard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Malik ( CPSO# 86890 )
Dr. J. Howard ( CPSO# 86532 )

Business Address:
36 Heritage Drive
Box 160
Ilderton ON  N0M 2A0
Phone Number: (519) 666-1610

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7

Business Address:
450 Blanches Street
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-4325

Business Address:
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-2700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRAZ AKRAM MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009