Malisic, Dragoljub (CPSO#: 91780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
900 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1A5
Phone: 4167469009
Fax: 4167469019
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3107 Bloor Street West # 207
Etobicoke ON  M8X 1E2
Canada
Phone: (647) 971-8383
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Malisic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Malisic ( CPSO# 91780 )

Business Address:
900 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1A5
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Business Address:
Suite 207
3107 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke ON  M8X 1E4
Phone Number: (647) 971-8383

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DRAGOLJUB MALISIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALISIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2011