Mallory, Jonathan Glenn (CPSO#: 67961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Buckhorn Regional Health Centre
18 William Street
Box 209
Buckhorn ON  K0L 1J0
Phone: (705) 657-7933
Fax: (705) 657-3176
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Curve Lake Health Centre
38 whetung street east
Curve Lake ON  K0L 1R0
Canada
Phone: (705) 657-1544
Fax: (705) 657-2371
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Dr.
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 743-2121
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Mallory Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mallory ( CPSO# 67961 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
38 Whetung Street East
Curve Lake ON  K0L 1R0
Phone Number: (705) 657-2557

Business Address:
865 Williams Street
Buckhorn ON  K0L 1J0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN GLENN MALLORY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALLORY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1996