Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Maloney, Robert John (CPSO#: 54454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 5352
Fax: (705) 759-3731
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Maloney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Maloney ( CPSO# 54454 )

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN MALONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALONEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1985