Manchul, Lee Ann (CPSO#: 52635)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Devlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Manchul ( CPSO# 52635 )
Dr. H. Devlin ( CPSO# 31539 )

Business Address:
Room R3 89
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone Number: (416) 243-3680

Medical Records Location

Address: Princess Margaret Hospital 610 University Ave Toronto, ON M5G 2M9
Date Received: 05 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017