Mand, Ravinder Paul (CPSO#: 94228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Dr. East
Brampton ON  L6R3J7
Phone: (905) 4942120
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Princess Anne Dr
Halton Hills ON  L7G2B8
Canada
Phone: 9058730111 Ext. 8505
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Mand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mand ( CPSO# 94228 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAVINDER PAUL MAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2010 to 26 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2012