Mandel, Karen Miriam (CPSO#: 63907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham KidsKare
1615 Dundas St E
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone: (905) 4362273
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CHEO
Division of Heme/Onc
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: 613 737 7600 Ext. 2210
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Mandel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mandel ( CPSO# 63907 )

Business Address:
CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
Durham KidsKare
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 436-2273

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 09 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN MIRIAM MANDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANDEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992