Mandelcorn, Efrem Dov (CPSO#: 79474)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
399 Bathurst Street
6-East Room 432
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5418
Fax: (416) 603-5193
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2180 Steeles Ave W
Suite 221
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 761-7002
Fax: (905) 761-7003
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

7900 Hurontario Street
Unit 401
Brampton ON  L6Y0P6
Canada
Phone: 905-456-9500
Fax: 905-456-9508
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T3A9
Canada
Phone: 416-928-1335
Fax: 416-928-5075
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Efrem Mandelcorn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mandelcorn ( CPSO# 79474 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 6E-415
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5418

Business Address:
401 - 7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6

Business Address:
Suite 221
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (905) 761-7002

Business Address:
Suite 501
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-1335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EFREM DOV MANDELCORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANDELCORN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008