Mandelman, Krystyna (CPSO#: 42253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone: (416) 398-8387
Fax: (416) 398-0285
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Krystyna Mandelman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mandelman ( CPSO# 42253 )

Business Address:
205 - 4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 398-8387

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRYSTYNA MANDELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANDELMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1989