Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mangar, Mohini (CPSO#: 60548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Halton Mental Health Clinic
217 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 1N9
Phone: (905) 693-4240
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Halton Mental Health Clinic
280 Guelph Street, Unit 75
Georgetown ON  L7G 4B1
Canada
Phone: (905) 693-4240
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHINI MANGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANGAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Nov 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Nov 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 14 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1989