Manley, Paul Nathan (CPSO#: 21495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology and
Molecular Medicine
Queen's University
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2819
Fax: (613) 533-2907
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul N. Manley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Manley ( CPSO# 21495 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Department of Pathology and Molecular Medicine
88 Stuart Street
Suite 201-B
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2819

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 21 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL NATHAN MANLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973