Manlucu, Jaimie (CPSO#: 80690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Internal Medicine
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Cardiac Institute
256 Pall Mall
Unit 302
London ON  N6A 5P6
Canada
Phone: (519) 645-0146
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leong-Sit Manlucu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Leong-Sit ( CPSO# 76500 )
Dr. J. Manlucu ( CPSO# 80690 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Cardiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3746

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAIMIE MANLUCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANLUCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2008