Manohar, Prethima (CPSO#: 62956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
170 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone: (905) 272-3899
Fax: (905) 272-7005
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Community Mental Health
Clinic
2085 HWY 10
Mississauga ON  L5A 4G1
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7586
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. & P. Manohar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Manohar ( CPSO# 62956 )
Dr. S. Manohar ( CPSO# 62793 )

Business Address:
106 - 170 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone Number: (905) 272-3899

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRETHIMA MANOHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOHAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991