Mansfield, Alexander Israel (CPSO#: 91154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander I. Mansfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mansfield ( CPSO# 91154 )

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER ISRAEL MANSFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSFIELD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015