Mansfield, Robert Warren (CPSO#: 86644)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON  M3M0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1939 Kennedy Rd #1
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 332-2244
Fax: (416) 299-7829
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Mansfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mansfield ( CPSO# 86644 )

Business Address:
1 - 1939 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Phone Number: (416) 332-0795

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 10 Nov 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT WARREN MANSFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSFIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009