Mantay, Erica Mary Elizabeth Cooper (CPSO#: 60784)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: Mantay, Erica Mary Elizabeth (used until: 04 Oct 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
712 Davis Drive
Suite 303
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone: (905) 898-6575
Fax: (905) 898-6676
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erica Mantay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mantay ( CPSO# 60784 )

Business Address:
303 - 712 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone Number: (905) 898-6575

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERICA MARY ELIZABETH COOPER MANTAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANTAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990