Mantynen, Philip Russell (CPSO#: 52945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Franklin Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 8N8
Phone: (519) 620-3600
Fax: (519) 623-2662
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Mantynen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mantynen ( CPSO# 52945 )

Business Address:
200 Franklin Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 8N8
Phone Number: (519) 620-3600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP RUSSELL MANTYNEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANTYNEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2000