Manzig, Gloria Blanche Irene (CPSO#: 68353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Calgary, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 507
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 729-1165
Fax: (613) 728-3083
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grant Stotts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Stotts ( CPSO# 68313 )
Dr. G. Manzig ( CPSO# 68353 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Neurology, C2-184
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-5353

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLORIA BLANCHE IRENE MANZIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANZIG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 16 Sep 1996 to 31 Mar 1997
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1996