Marchi, Nicholas Alfred (CPSO#: 87590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone: (905) 871-1220
Fax: (905) 871-1221
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Marchi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Marchi ( CPSO# 87590 )

Business Address:
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone Number: (905) 871-1220

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS ALFRED MARCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2011