Marchie, Augustine (CPSO#: 88827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 647 873 8991
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

375 Kingston Road
Unit #6
Pickering ON  L1V 1A3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Augustine Marchie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marchie ( CPSO# 88827 )

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4

Business Address:
160 Main Street South
Brampton ON  L6W 2E1

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3

Business Address:
Suite 6
375 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 509-6888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AUGUSTINE MARCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2011