Marcus, Herbert Isaac (CPSO#: 33540)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa,On
L1G 2B9
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3200
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Herbert Marcus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Marcus ( CPSO# 33540 )

Business Address:
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
Suite C2-160G
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HERBERT ISAAC MARCUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCUS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1986