Marcus, Jonathan Mayer (CPSO#: 64407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCI the Doctors' Office
at Six Points Plaza
5230 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9B 1A8
Phone: (416)234-8668
Fax: (416)234-8720
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCI the Doctor's Office at Richview
250 Wincott Drive, Unit 12
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2R5
Canada
Phone: 416-249-0002
Fax: 416-249-0842
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

MCI The Doctor's Office at Bloor
345 Bloor Street E, Suite 4A
Toronto ON  M4W 3J6
Canada
Phone: 416-515-0590
Fax: 416-515-8853
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Marcus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Marcus ( CPSO# 64407 )

Business Address:
MCI the Doctor's Office
at Six Points Plaza
5320 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9B 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 234-8668

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN MAYER MARCUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Aug 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 May 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 May 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1996