Marginean, Esmeralda Celia (CPSO#: 83796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Patholology
Room 4251
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79081
Fax: (613) 737-8461
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Celia Marginean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Marginean ( CPSO# 83796 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Pathology
CCW Room 4251
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-9081

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 02 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESMERALDA CELIA MARGINEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARGINEAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2009