Marignani, Marilena (CPSO#: 62132)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
272 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 1S9
Phone: (519) 438-1130
Fax: (519) 438-0861
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marignani Razvi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Razvi ( CPSO# 61423 )
Dr. M. Marignani ( CPSO# 62132 )

Business Address:
272 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 1S9
Phone Number: (519) 438-1130

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
Room B4-658
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6259

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 29 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARILENA MARIGNANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARIGNANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Mar 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991