Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mark, Patrick Weng-Sing (CPSO#: 63876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Michael Garron Hospital
J6100 - 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6212
Fax: (416) 469-6874
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

199 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Canada
Phone: (416) 961-6044
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

195 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Canada
Phone: (416) 929-7072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

31 Alvin Avenue
Toronto ON  M4T 2A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 926-8122
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

401 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-1599
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

214 - 20 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M2P 2C2
Canada
Phone: (416) 449-9983
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mark ( CPSO# 63876 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Suite J6100
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Business Address:
199 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3

Business Address:
195 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3

Business Address:
31 Alvin Avenue
Toronto ON  M4T 2A7

Business Address:
401 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK WENG-SING MARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992