Markus, Jurgita Rachel (CPSO#: 87217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Names: Treigys, Jurgita (used until: 17 Oct 2011 )     Treigiene, Jurgita (used until: 19 Aug 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:Kaunas State University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100 Ext. 7628
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jurgita R. Markus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Markus ( CPSO# 87217 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JURGITA RACHEL MARKUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012