Markus, Yaacov Michael (CPSO#: 76390)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vector Medical Group
1136 Centre Street
Suite 209
Thornhill ON  L4J 3M8
Phone: (905) 597-5744
Fax: 416-352-5035
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Canada
171 Slater Street - 9th Floor
Ottawa ON  K1P 5H7
Canada
Phone: 613-957-3711
Fax: 613-957-0165
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

267 Baythorn Ave
Thornhill ON
Thornhill ON  L3T 3V8
Canada
Phone: 905-762-0404
Fax: 905-762-0408
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. M. Markus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Markus ( CPSO# 76390 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
1136 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 3W8
Phone Number: (905) 597-5744

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YAACOV MICHAEL MARKUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006