Marotta, Giovanni Carmine (CPSO#: 56831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CNIB Building
Suite 203
1929 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 663-4124
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Division of Geriatrics
HG69
Toronto ON  M4N 3N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4076
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
University Health Network
550 University Ave
Musculoskeletal Program
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 4514
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Giovanni Marotta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Marotta ( CPSO# 56831 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
HG69 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
MSK Program
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
Suite 203
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 663-4124

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIOVANNI CARMINE MAROTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAROTTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1987