Marrocco, Angela Marie Patricia (CPSO#: 79442)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272 Ext. 6435
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

750 Great Northern Road
Emergency Department
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
Emergency Dept
3030 Lawrence Ave. E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 8181
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough Hospital
Emergency Department
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2550 Ext. 0
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Marrocco Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marrocco ( CPSO# 79442 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital - Grace Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Emergency Department
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2550

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8181

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA MARIE PATRICIA MARROCCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARROCCO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005